+ − Summaries (10)
+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (33)
On November 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On August 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- Ordered to second reading.
- From inactive file.
On September 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Hertzberg.
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On September 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On August 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 27).
On August 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On July 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 14).
On July 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (July 7). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On June 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On June 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and JUD.
On May 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 12. Page 1583.)
On May 14, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 13, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 13).
On April 30, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
On April 22, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
On April 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
On April 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On April 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
On January 22, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and P. & C.P.
On January 5, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On December 3, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee January 2.
On December 2, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (12)
August 27, 2015: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
August 17, 2015: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
July 14, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
July 14, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
July 7, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
July 7, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
May 26, 2015: AB 56 QUIRK Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 7
May 13, 2015: Do pass.
- Yeas: 17
April 30, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
April 30, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
April 14, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
April 14, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor