+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (37)
On March 29, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 3, Statutes of 2016.
- Approved by the Governor.
On March 21, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On March 17, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 67. Noes 0. Page 3975.).
On March 10, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (March 10).
On March 3, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on G.O. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after March 5 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3172.).
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended.
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (February 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
On February 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
- Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly.
On August 24, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Withdrawn from Engrossing and Enrolling.
- Ordered to the Senate.
On August 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Held at Desk.
On August 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On August 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2117.).
On August 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On August 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
On July 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On June 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on G.O.
On May 14, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1448.)
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 7, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On May 6, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 6).
On April 22, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
On April 6, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
On March 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Coms. on A. & A.R. and P. & C.P.
On February 24, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
On February 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (14)
March 17, 2016: AB 558 LOW Concurrence - Urgency Added By GRAY
- Yeas: 67
- Present/NV: 12
March 10, 2016: With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in.
- Yeas: 20
- Present/NV: 1
March 3, 2016: Assembly 3rd Reading AB558 Low By Hall Urgency Clause
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
February 23, 2016: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 3
August 20, 2015: Consent Calendar 2nd AB558 Low
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
June 29, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 1
June 29, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 1
May 14, 2015: AB 558 LOW Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 2
May 14, 2015: AB 558 LOW Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 2
May 6, 2015: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
April 21, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 11
April 21, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 11
April 15, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 9
April 15, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor