+ − Summaries (10)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (35)
On September 21, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Vetoed by Governor.
On September 4, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On August 27, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 6667.).
On August 23, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 23).
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 21. Page 6468.)
On August 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
On August 14, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 16 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 5267.).
On August 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On June 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
On May 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
On May 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on T. & H. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 16). Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ.
On July 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Coms. on EQ. and T. & H.
On June 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from committee.
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On June 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On June 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 31, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 1. Page 1908.)
On May 30, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (May 26).
On May 10, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 27, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 25, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 18).
On March 28, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 23, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On March 22, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
On March 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On February 27, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On February 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
On February 14, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
August 27, 2018: AB 558 QUIRK-SILVA Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 69
- Present/NV: 11
August 23, 2018: With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in.
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 2
August 13, 2018: Assembly 3rd Reading AB558 Quirk-Silva By Wieckowski
- Yeas: 35
- Present/NV: 5
June 12, 2018: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 1
May 16, 2018: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation and Housing]
- Yeas: 7
May 31, 2017: AB 558 QUIRK-SILVA Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 75
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 4
May 26, 2017: Do pass.
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 1
April 18, 2017: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor