+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (23)
On September 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 330, Statutes of 2015.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 14, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On September 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 2804.).
- Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 2795.)
On September 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2341.).
On August 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On July 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (July 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On April 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 13, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 885.)
On April 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On April 7, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 7).
On March 5, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On February 24, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
On February 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
September 2, 2015: AB 555 ALEJO Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 80
September 1, 2015: Assembly 3rd Reading AB555 Alejo By Hertzberg
- Yeas: 40
July 14, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
July 14, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
April 13, 2015: AB 555 ALEJO Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 1
April 13, 2015: AB 555 ALEJO Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 1
April 7, 2015: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor