+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On September 26, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 364, Statutes of 2013.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 3, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
On August 26, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On August 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1978.).
On August 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 12).
On June 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on G.O.
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1342.)
On May 6, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On May 2, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 1).
On April 17, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 10, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
On April 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. Read second time and amended.
On March 7, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
On February 21, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
On February 20, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 26, 2013: Assembly 3rd Reading AB554 Mullin By Roth
- Yeas: 39
August 12, 2013: Do pass.
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
June 25, 2013: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent.
- Yeas: 11
May 9, 2013: AB 554 MULLIN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 75
- Present/NV: 4
May 1, 2013: Do pass, to Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
April 17, 2013: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor