+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (27)
On November 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On August 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On August 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On August 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On June 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 25).
On June 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Measure version as amended on June 14 corrected.
On June 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 63. Noes 12. Page 1809.)
On May 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 16, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 4.) (May 16).
On May 8, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On May 1, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 30, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
On April 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (April 8).
On April 2, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On April 1, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
On March 18, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On March 14, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On February 14, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
On February 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
August 19, 2019: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
June 25, 2019: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
May 22, 2019: AB 552 Mark Stone Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 63
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 5
May 16, 2019: Do pass.
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 4
April 8, 2019: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor