+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (25)
On September 25, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 599, Statutes of 2016.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 2, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m.
On August 29, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 65. Noes 15. Page 6349.).
On August 24, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 10. Page 5271.).
On August 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered to second reading.
- From inactive file.
On September 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Jackson.
On July 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On July 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (July 7).
On June 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 3, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 63. Noes 11. Page 1840.)
On May 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 14, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On May 13, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 12).
On April 6, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On February 24, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
On February 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (4)
August 29, 2016: AB 551 NAZARIAN Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 65
- Nays: 15
August 23, 2016: Assembly 3rd Reading AB551 Nazarian By Jackson
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 10
June 3, 2015: AB 551 NAZARIAN Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 63
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 6
May 12, 2015: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor