+ − Summaries (10)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On January 21, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
On October 12, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Vetoed by Governor.
On September 18, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On September 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3298.).
- Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3252.)
On September 9, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2710.).
On September 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On September 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30).
On August 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On June 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on V.A.
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1870.)
On May 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 16, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 16).
On April 3, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On March 27, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On February 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on V.A.
On February 14, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
On February 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
September 10, 2019: AB 550 Flora Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 79
September 9, 2019: Assembly 3rd Reading AB550 Flora et al. By Hill
- Yeas: 40
August 30, 2019: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 7
August 12, 2019: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 25, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
May 23, 2019: AB 550 Flora Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 2
May 16, 2019: Do pass.
- Yeas: 18
March 26, 2019: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor