+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On February 3, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 31, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
On May 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
On May 1, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 11, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On February 20, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
On February 19, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended.
On February 15, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on G.O.
On January 8, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 7.
On January 7, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Vote
April 10, 2013: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 13
- Present/NV: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor