+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On August 15, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 203, Statutes of 2014.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On August 4, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5839.).
On July 3, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 1 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On July 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4255.).
On June 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On June 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On May 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 14).
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On January 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On January 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 3743.)
On January 29, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From consent calendar.
On January 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
- From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (January 23).
On January 15, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (January 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On January 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
On January 7, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
On January 6, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
On February 21, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
On February 20, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 4, 2014: AB 548 SALAS Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 1
July 3, 2014: Special Consent #18 AB548 Salas
- Yeas: 35
- Present/NV: 5
May 14, 2014: Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 2
January 30, 2014: AB 548 SALAS Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
January 23, 2014: Do pass, to Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 1
January 14, 2014: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor