+ − Summaries (9)
+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (31)
On October 10, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 630, Statutes of 2017.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
On September 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 62. Noes 15. Page 3325.).
- Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 25. Page 3255.)
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 15 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 5. Page 2781.).
On September 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On September 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (September 1).
On August 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On July 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on T. & H.
On June 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 63. Noes 9. Page 2068.)
On May 30, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 24. Page 1776.)
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On May 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 26).
On May 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On May 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 27, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (April 24).
On March 22, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On March 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
On March 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on TRANS.
On February 14, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
On February 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
September 13, 2017: AB 544 Bloom Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 62
- Nays: 15
- Present/NV: 2
September 12, 2017: Assembly 3rd Reading AB544 Bloom By Wieckowski
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 3
August 21, 2017: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
July 11, 2017: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 1
June 1, 2017: AB 544 BLOOM Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 63
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 8
May 26, 2017: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 5
April 24, 2017: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor