+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On November 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On August 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On July 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to suspense file.
On June 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On June 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 2, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1832.)
On May 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1460.)
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 20).
On May 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 28, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 27, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 26, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 20).
On April 15, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Coauthors revised.
On April 7, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On February 18, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on AGING & L.T.C. and HEALTH.
On February 11, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 13.
On February 10, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Votes (6)
July 15, 2021: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 30, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1
June 2, 2021: AB 540 Petrie-Norris Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 1
May 20, 2021: Do pass.
- Yeas: 16
April 20, 2021: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 15
April 6, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Health]
- Yeas: 7