+ − Summaries (10)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (29)
On October 12, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 793, Statutes of 2019.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 26, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On September 14, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3609.).
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On September 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2948.).
On September 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 12).
On September 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On September 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ.
- Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 2746.)
On September 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from committee.
- Joint Rules 61 and 62 suspended. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 2689.)
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
- Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
On September 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On June 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 4). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on JUD. and PUB. S.
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On March 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 6. Page 813.).
On March 21, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On March 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (March 20).
On March 12, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On February 26, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (February 26). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On January 17, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and JUD.
On December 4, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee January 3.
On December 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
September 14, 2019: AB 54 Ting Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 2
September 13, 2019: Assembly 3rd Reading AB54 Ting et al. By Skinner Urgency Clause
- Yeas: 40
June 11, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
June 4, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety]
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 2
March 25, 2019: AB 54 Ting Third Reading Urgency
- Yeas: 65
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 9
March 20, 2019: Do pass.
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 6
March 12, 2019: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 11
- Present/NV: 1
February 26, 2019: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 8