+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On February 1, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Died on third reading file.
On January 23, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From inactive file.
On January 22, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Jones-Sawyer.
On June 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Jones-Sawyer.
On March 22, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On March 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (March 21).
On February 27, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On February 14, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
On February 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Vote
March 21, 2017: Do pass.
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor