+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On November 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On August 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On August 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On July 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and JUD.
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1935.)
On May 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 16, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 16).
On April 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On March 27, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On February 21, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
On February 14, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
On February 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 12, 2019: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
July 9, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
June 24, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 6
May 23, 2019: AB 531 Friedman Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 3
May 16, 2019: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 18
March 26, 2019: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor