+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On February 1, 2024 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 31, 2024 in the Assembly:
- Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
On September 14, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
On August 14, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On July 13, 2023 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Read second time and amended.
On June 8, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
On May 16, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On May 15, 2023 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
On April 20, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Measure version as amended on March 9 corrected.
On March 13, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On March 9, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
On February 9, 2023 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 11.
On February 8, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor