+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (22)
On October 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 684, Statutes of 2015.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On September 3, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 2869.).
- Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 2859.)
On September 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 4 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2403.).
On August 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On August 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 27).
On August 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On July 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 3, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1888.)
On June 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28).
On May 6, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 5, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
On February 24, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
On February 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (9)
September 3, 2015: AB 530 RENDON Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 80
September 2, 2015: Assembly 3rd Reading AB530 Rendon By Lara
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
August 17, 2015: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
July 14, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 9
July 14, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 9
June 3, 2015: AB 530 RENDON Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 1
May 28, 2015: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 17
April 28, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 15
April 28, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 15