+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On September 21, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 292, Statutes of 2015.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 25, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On August 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 7. Page 2154.).
On August 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On July 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (July 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On May 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on T. & H.
On May 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 11, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 13. Page 1382.)
On May 7, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 6, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 3.) (May 6).
On April 21, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On April 14, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
On April 13, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On January 22, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and APPR.
On December 2, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee January 1.
On December 1, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 24, 2015: Assembly 3rd Reading AB53 Cristina Garcia By Pan
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 1
July 7, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 1
July 7, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 1
May 11, 2015: AB 53 GARCIA, C. Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 65
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 2
May 6, 2015: Do pass.
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 3
April 20, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 2
April 20, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor