+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (18)
On November 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
On August 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On July 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage.
On June 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
On June 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 31, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 67. Noes 4. Page 1983.)
On May 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 11, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On May 10, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (May 3).
On April 25, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 24, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
On April 4, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 29, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
On March 28, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P., & W. Read second time and amended.
On February 27, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
On February 14, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
On February 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (4)
July 11, 2017: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 4
May 31, 2017: AB 521 FRAZIER Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 67
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 9
May 3, 2017: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
April 4, 2017: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor