+ − Summaries (9)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (32)
On January 15, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
On October 11, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Vetoed by Governor.
On September 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On September 11, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 53. Noes 20. Page 3141.).
On September 10, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On September 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 2688.).
On September 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 27).
On August 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On July 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
- Withdrawn from committee.
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (July 8). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On June 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD.
On June 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 4, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 21. Page 1922.)
On June 3, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On June 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28).
On May 6, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 22, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (April 21).
On April 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On April 14, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
On March 5, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On February 24, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
On February 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (10)
September 11, 2015: AB 521 NAZARIAN Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 20
- Present/NV: 7
September 10, 2015: Assembly 3rd Reading AB521 Nazarian By Hall
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 2
August 27, 2015: Do pass
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
August 17, 2015: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
July 8, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
July 8, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
June 4, 2015: AB 521 NAZARIAN Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 21
- Present/NV: 8
May 28, 2015: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 5
April 21, 2015: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 1
April 21, 2015: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor