+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On February 3, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 31, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
On May 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
On April 17, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 11, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 4, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on L. & E.
On February 21, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
On February 20, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Vote
April 10, 2013: Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor