+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (27)
On February 7, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
On January 3, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
On October 4, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Vetoed by Governor.
On September 15, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
On September 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2903.).
- Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 59. Noes 17. Page 2875.)
On September 7, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 9 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2464.).
On September 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On July 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On June 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On June 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1067.)
On April 15, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 14, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 14).
On March 26, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On March 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 23).
On February 18, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On February 10, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 12.
On February 9, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (5)
+ − Votes (6)
September 8, 2021: AB 515 Chen Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 1
September 7, 2021: Assembly 3rd Reading AB515 Chen By Ochoa Bogh
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
June 15, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1
April 19, 2021: AB 515 Chen Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 1
April 14, 2021: Do pass.
- Yeas: 16
March 23, 2021: Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor