+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On November 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On June 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
On May 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on E.Q. and JUD.
On January 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On January 27, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 64. Noes 4. Page 3683.)
On January 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (January 23).
On January 14, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (January 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On January 13, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (January 13). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On January 9, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Ayes 50. Noes 22. Page 3537.)
- Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Ayes 50. Noes 22. Page 3537.)
- (pending re-referral to the Com. on JUD.)
On January 6, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be re-referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (January 6). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
On April 23, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 12, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 11, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
- Re-referred to Coms. on JUD. and NAT. RES. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
On March 4, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and JUD.
On February 21, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
On February 20, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
January 27, 2014: AB 515 DICKINSON Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 64
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 12
January 23, 2014: Do pass.
- Yeas: 15
- Present/NV: 2
January 14, 2014: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 1
January 13, 2014: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 3
January 6, 2014: Be referred to Committee on Natural Resources.
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor