+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On October 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor.
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 711, Statutes of 2019.
On September 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On September 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On September 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 11. Page 2572.).
On August 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30).
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On July 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (July 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on L., P.E. & R. and JUD.
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 20. Page 1784.)
On May 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 16, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (May 16).
On April 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On March 27, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 26, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On March 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (March 19).
On March 7, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (March 6). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On January 17, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and JUD.
On December 4, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee January 3.
On December 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
September 5, 2019: Assembly 3rd Reading AB51 Gonzalez By Jackson
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 3
August 12, 2019: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
July 9, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
June 19, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
May 22, 2019: AB 51 Gonzalez Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 20
- Present/NV: 13
May 16, 2019: Do pass.
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 5
March 19, 2019: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 3
March 6, 2019: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor