+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On February 1, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 31, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
On February 18, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On February 10, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 12.
On February 9, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.