+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On September 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 195, Statutes of 2017.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 25, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On August 22, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On August 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 2. Page 2176.).
On June 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On June 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 4, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1390.)
On April 27, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On April 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 26).
On April 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 4, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
On February 27, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and HIGHER ED.
On February 14, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
On February 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 21, 2017: Assembly 3rd Reading AB508 Santiago By Pan
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 3
June 5, 2017: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
May 4, 2017: AB 508 SANTIAGO Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
April 26, 2017: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 1
April 18, 2017: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 1
April 4, 2017: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Higher Education]
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor