+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (10)
+ − Actions (36)
On September 27, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 352, Statutes of 2019.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On September 5, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 60. Noes 15. Page 3016.).
On September 3, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 5 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 2446.).
On August 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On August 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On July 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On July 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (July 3).
On June 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On June 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ.
- Referred to Coms. on EQ. and GOV. & F.
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 18. Page 1868.)
On May 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 16, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (May 16).
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1760.)
On May 15, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On May 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1609.)
On May 7, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 6, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
On April 30, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 29, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 24).
On April 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On April 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 9).
On March 26, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
On March 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and L. GOV.
On February 14, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
On February 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
September 5, 2019: AB 508 Chu Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 15
- Present/NV: 4
September 3, 2019: Assembly 3rd Reading AB508 Chu By Hertzberg
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 4
July 10, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
July 3, 2019: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Governance and Finance]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
May 23, 2019: AB 508 Chu Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 4
May 16, 2019: Do pass.
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
April 24, 2019: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 1
April 9, 2019: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsor
Chu
Type:
Primary Sponsor