+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (23)
On January 15, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
On October 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Vetoed by Governor.
On September 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On September 10, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 52. Noes 78. Page 3057.).
On September 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On September 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 14. Page 2635.).
On September 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On August 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 15).
On July 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On June 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 14, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 27. Page 1441.)
On May 11, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 7, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (May 6).
On April 6, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On March 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On February 24, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
On February 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
September 10, 2015: AB 504 GONZALEZ Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 28
September 9, 2015: Assembly 3rd Reading AB504 Gonzalez By Block
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 14
July 15, 2015: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
May 14, 2015: AB 504 GONZALEZ Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 27
May 6, 2015: Do pass.
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor