+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (29)
On September 29, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Vetoed by Governor.
On September 13, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 31, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 45. Noes 22.).
On August 30, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On August 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 13.).
On August 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On June 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- From inactive file.
- Ordered to second reading.
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On August 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Kamlager.
On August 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On July 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 1721.) (June 29).
On June 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On June 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On May 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Reconsideration granted. (Page 1064.)
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 41. Noes 22. Page 1072.)
On April 12, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 35. Noes 22. Page 966.).
- Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Stone.
On March 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On March 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (March 23).
On February 18, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On February 10, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 12.
On February 9, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (4)
+ − Votes (4)
August 31, 2022: AB 503 Stone Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 22
- Present/NV: 13
August 30, 2022: Assembly 3rd Reading AB503 Stone et al. By Kamlager
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 6
April 12, 2021: AB 503 Stone Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 22
- Present/NV: 21
March 23, 2021: Do pass.
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2