+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On November 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On August 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On August 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On July 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 25).
On June 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On August 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On June 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O.
On June 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on G.O.
On May 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 29, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 18. Page 1743.)
On May 28, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 24).
On May 15, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On May 2, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (May 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 25, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
On April 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. Read second time and amended.
On March 4, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on A. & A.R. and HUM. S.
On February 21, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
On February 20, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
June 25, 2014: Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
August 12, 2013: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
June 25, 2013: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
May 29, 2013: AB 503 WIECKOWSKI Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 3
May 24, 2013: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 17
May 1, 2013: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 3