+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (31)
On October 4, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 531, Statutes of 2013.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 20, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On September 10, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 2. Page 3100.).
- Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 3064.)
- Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 3064.)
On September 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2248.).
On September 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30).
On August 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On July 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On May 29, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1742.)
On May 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 28, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 24).
On May 15, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On May 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 7, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On May 6, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 4.) (April 30).
On April 23, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On April 16, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 2, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On April 1, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
On March 4, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On February 21, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
On February 20, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
September 10, 2013: AB 502 WAGNER Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 76
- Nays: 2
September 9, 2013: Assembly 3rd Reading AB502 Wagner By Corbett
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 1
August 30, 2013: Do pass.
- Yeas: 7
August 12, 2013: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
July 2, 2013: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
May 29, 2013: AB 502 WAGNER Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 2
May 24, 2013: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 17
April 30, 2013: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor