+ − Summaries (10)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (33)
On January 15, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
On October 10, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Vetoed by Governor.
On September 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On September 11, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3152.).
On September 10, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On September 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2694.).
On September 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On September 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On August 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 27).
On August 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On July 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1767.)
On May 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1613.)
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28).
On May 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On May 22, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 21, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
On May 14, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 13, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
On April 22, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 21, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 14).
On April 7, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
- Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On April 6, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
On January 22, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On December 2, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee January 1.
On December 1, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (10)
September 11, 2015: AB 50 MULLIN Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 1
September 10, 2015: Assembly 3rd Reading AB50 Mullin By Monning
- Yeas: 40
August 27, 2015: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 7
August 17, 2015: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
July 8, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
July 8, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
June 2, 2015: AB 50 MULLIN Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 1
May 28, 2015: Do pass.
- Yeas: 17
April 14, 2015: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 3
April 14, 2015: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor