+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (28)
On September 23, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor.
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 220, Statutes of 2023.
On September 15, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On September 11, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 65. Noes 0.).
On September 7, 2023 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 9 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 7, 2023 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 3. Page 2455.).
On September 5, 2023 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 1, 2023 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (September 1).
On August 14, 2023 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file.
On July 13, 2023 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 31, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On May 23, 2023 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 22, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 64. Noes 4. Page 1702.)
On May 18, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1580.)
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (May 18).
On May 17, 2023 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On May 3, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 2, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On May 1, 2023 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 26).
On April 18, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On April 17, 2023 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
On March 27, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On March 23, 2023 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On December 6, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee January 5.
On December 5, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Votes (8)
September 11, 2023: AB 5 Zbur Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 65
- Present/NV: 15
September 7, 2023: Assembly 3rd Reading AB5 Zbur et al. By Menjivar
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 5
September 1, 2023: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
August 14, 2023: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
July 12, 2023: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
May 22, 2023: AB 5 Zbur Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 64
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 12
May 18, 2023: Do pass.
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 4
April 26, 2023: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor