+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On September 24, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 549, Statutes of 2016.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 8, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6446.).
On August 25, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 25).
On August 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on INS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
On June 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On June 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4649.).
On June 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On June 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 22).
On June 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on INS.
On June 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from committee.
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On June 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
On June 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 4, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1263.)
On April 29, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On April 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 28).
On March 5, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
On February 24, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
On February 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 30, 2016: AB 499 COOLEY Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 80
August 25, 2016: With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in.
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 1
June 30, 2016: Consent Calendar 2nd AB499 Cooley
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
June 22, 2016: Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
May 4, 2015: AB 499 COOLEY Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 2
May 4, 2015: AB 499 COOLEY Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 2
April 28, 2015: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 15
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor