+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On August 10, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 149, Statutes of 2015.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 3, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On July 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On July 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1874.).
On June 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 10).
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 971.)
On April 13, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 8).
On March 5, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On February 24, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
On February 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (4)
July 9, 2015: Assembly 3rd Reading AB495 Gordon By Hancock
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
June 10, 2015: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 7
April 16, 2015: AB 495 GORDON Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 1
April 8, 2015: Do pass.
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor