+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (22)
On October 4, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 464, Statutes of 2021.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 7, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 31, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On August 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2240.).
On August 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On August 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
On July 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On May 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on INS. and JUD.
On May 6, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1335.)
On May 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 29, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On April 28, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 28).
On April 15, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 6, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on INS.
On April 5, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended.
On March 11, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on INS.
On March 10, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended.
On February 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on INS.
On February 10, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 12.
On February 9, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (5)
+ − Votes (6)
August 30, 2021: Consent Calendar AB494
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
July 6, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 11
June 24, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 12
May 6, 2021: AB 494 Mayes Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 1
April 28, 2021: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 16
April 15, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor