+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (40)
On September 16, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 351, Statutes of 2014.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 10, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6678.).
- Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6667.)
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4931.).
On August 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4894.).
- Motion to reconsider made by Senator Jackson.
- Reconsideration of favorable vote granted.
- (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4909.)
- Ordered to third reading.
On August 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered to second reading.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On August 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On August 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On August 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On August 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On July 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
On July 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On June 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On June 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 30, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1786.)
On May 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 24).
On May 1, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 18, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
On April 16, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On April 8, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On January 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on TRANS.
On January 7, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On December 24, 2012 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee January 23.
On December 21, 2012 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 28, 2014: AB 49 BUCHANAN Concurrence - Urgency Added
- Yeas: 79
August 27, 2014: Assembly 3rd Reading AB49 Buchanan By Jackson Reconsider
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 4
August 27, 2014: Assembly 3rd Reading AB49 Buchanan By Jackson Urgency Clause
- Yeas: 35
- Present/NV: 5
July 9, 2013: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent.
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1
May 30, 2013: AB 49 BUCHANAN Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 1
May 24, 2013: Do pass.
- Yeas: 17
April 15, 2013: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 16
+ − Sponsors (88)
Type:
Primary Sponsor