+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (22)
On October 12, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 803, Statutes of 2019.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On September 5, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 62. Noes 16. Page 3016.).
On September 3, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 5 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 11. Page 2447.).
On August 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On July 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On July 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On June 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On June 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 2, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 17. Page 1470.)
On April 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 4.) (April 24).
On April 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On February 21, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On February 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 15.
On February 12, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
September 5, 2019: AB 485 Medina Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 62
- Nays: 16
- Present/NV: 1
September 3, 2019: Assembly 3rd Reading AB485 Medina By McGuire
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 11
June 26, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
May 2, 2019: AB 485 Medina Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 17
- Present/NV: 5
April 24, 2019: Do pass.
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 4
April 24, 2019: Noes: Bigelow, Brough, Diep, Fong
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 4
April 10, 2019: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor