+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (31)
On November 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Died on unfinished business file, concurrence pending.
On August 14, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 14).
On August 13, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 5998.)
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On August 6, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 3, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
On February 27, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
On February 25, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after February 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 7. Page 2819.).
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On January 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (January 23).
On January 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On January 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On January 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (January 15).
On September 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (September 11). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On September 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Ayes 27. Noes 6. Page 2315.)
- Joint Rule 61(a) suspended. (Ayes 27. Noes 6. Page 2315.)
On September 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and HEALTH.
On September 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On June 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On June 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 30, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 22. Page 1790.)
On May 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (May 24).
On May 8, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 11, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S.
On February 20, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
On February 19, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (9)
August 5, 2014: Be referred to Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
August 5, 2014: Senate amendments be concurred in.
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
February 24, 2014: Assembly 3rd Reading AB485 Gomez By Yee
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 6
January 21, 2014: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
January 15, 2014: Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 2
September 11, 2013: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Health.
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
May 30, 2013: AB 485 GOMEZ Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 22
- Present/NV: 4
May 24, 2013: Do pass.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 4
April 24, 2013: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor