+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On February 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 31, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Died pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
On May 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On May 6, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 21, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E.
On April 14, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on J., E.D., & E. Read second time and amended.
On April 6, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E.
On March 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on J., E.D., & E. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E.
On February 24, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
On February 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
April 21, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
April 21, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor