+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (29)
On October 5, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 590, Statutes of 2013.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 25, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
On September 11, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 57. Noes 21. Page 3233.).
- Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3227.)
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 13 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 7. Page 2332.).
- Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2332.)
- Motion to reconsider made by Senator De León.
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 11. Page 2331.).
On September 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On August 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30).
On August 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On August 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On July 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
On June 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On June 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On June 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 30, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 57. Noes 19. Page 1841.).
On May 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 24).
On May 1, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 11, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 10, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (April 9).
On March 19, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. and TRANS.
On February 20, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
On February 19, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (9)
September 11, 2013: AB 482 ATKINS Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 21
September 11, 2013: Assembly 3rd Reading AB482 Atkins By De León
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 2
September 11, 2013: Assembly 3rd Reading AB482 Atkins By De León Reconsider
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 3
August 30, 2013: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
August 19, 2013: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 7
July 1, 2013: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
May 30, 2013: AB 482 ATKINS Third Reading Urgency
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 19
- Present/NV: 3
May 24, 2013: Do pass.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 5
April 9, 2013: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor