+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (24)
On September 30, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 404, Statutes of 2021.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 15, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
On September 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 49. Noes 19. Page 2920.).
On September 2, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 4 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 10. Page 2338.).
On August 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 26).
On August 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to suspense file.
On July 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (July 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On June 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 1, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 46. Noes 19. Page 1716.)
On May 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 20).
On April 21, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On March 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (March 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
- Coauthors revised.
On March 17, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On March 16, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
On January 11, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On December 8, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee January 7.
On December 7, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Votes (8)
September 8, 2021: AB 48 Lorena Gonzalez Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 19
- Present/NV: 12
September 2, 2021: Assembly 3rd Reading AB48 Lorena Gonzalez et a By Gonzalez
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 4
August 26, 2021: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
August 16, 2021: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
July 6, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
June 1, 2021: AB 48 Lorena Gonzalez Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 46
- Nays: 19
- Present/NV: 14
May 20, 2021: Do pass.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 4
March 23, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor