+ − Summaries (11)
+ − Full Texts (11)
+ − Actions (45)
On October 7, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 530, Statutes of 2019.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 26, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On September 14, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 1. Page 3617.).
On September 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (September 13).
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 3575.)
- Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On September 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 4. Page 2934.).
On September 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: That the measure be returned to Senate Floor for consideration. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (September 12)
On September 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b).
- From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on ED. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b). (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On September 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
- Joint Rule 61 suspended. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 2745.)
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- (Ayes 29. Noes 7. Page 2691.)
- Ordered to second reading.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On August 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 30). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On August 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On July 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (July 3).
On June 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On June 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
On June 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on ED. and GOV. & F.
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 1. Page 1973.)
On May 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 17, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 16).
On May 1, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
On April 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
On April 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
On April 2, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On April 1, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
On January 29, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On January 28, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
On January 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on ED. and HIGHER ED.
On December 4, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee January 3.
On December 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (12)
September 14, 2019: AB 48 O'Donnell Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 78
- Nays: 1
September 13, 2019: Assembly 3rd Reading AB48 O'Donnell et al.
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
September 13, 2019: With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in.
- Yeas: 11
- Present/NV: 1
September 12, 2019: That the measure be returned to Senate Floor for consideration. Ordered to third reading.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
August 30, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Rules]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
August 19, 2019: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
July 3, 2019: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
June 19, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance]
- Yeas: 7
May 24, 2019: AB 48 O'Donnell Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 69
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 10
May 16, 2019: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 4
April 23, 2019: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 3
April 10, 2019: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Higher Education]
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor