+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (18)
On November 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On July 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
On June 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 63. Noes 12. Page 1933.)
On May 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 16, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 4.) (May 16).
On April 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
On April 8, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 4, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 3, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (March 27).
On February 21, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On February 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 15.
On February 12, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (4)
July 3, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
May 23, 2019: AB 479 Nazarian Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 63
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 5
May 16, 2019: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 4
March 27, 2019: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 1