+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (24)
On November 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On August 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On August 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file.
On August 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On July 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (July 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On July 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (July 1).
On June 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
On June 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on E.Q. and JUD.
On May 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 27, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 3. Page 1641.)
On May 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (May 20).
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1460.)
On May 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 22, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 21, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (April 20).
On April 14, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 22, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On March 18, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and JUD.
On February 9, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 11.
On February 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (7)
+ − Votes (7)
August 23, 2021: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
July 13, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
July 1, 2021: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
May 27, 2021: AB 478 Ting Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 21
May 20, 2021: Do pass.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
April 20, 2021: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
April 14, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 3