+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (35)
On March 6, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
On January 6, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
On October 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Vetoed by Governor.
On September 25, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
On September 11, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 59. Noes 17. Page 3201.).
On September 10, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 3064.)
- Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 3064.)
- Re-referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 3147.)
- From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (September 10).
On September 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 8. Page 2232.).
On September 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On August 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30).
On August 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On May 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and JUD.
On May 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and PUB. S.
On May 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 59. Noes 16. Page 1321.)
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 6, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1262.)
On April 30, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 29, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 23).
On April 16, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C.
On April 15, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. Read second time and amended.
On February 28, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C.
On February 20, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
On February 19, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (9)
September 11, 2013: AB 477 CHAU Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 17
- Present/NV: 2
September 10, 2013: Senate amendments be concurred in.
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
September 9, 2013: Assembly 3rd Reading AB477 Chau By Corbett
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 1
August 30, 2013: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
August 12, 2013: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
July 2, 2013: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
June 11, 2013: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary.
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
May 9, 2013: AB 477 CHAU Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 16
- Present/NV: 4
April 23, 2013: Do pass.
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor