+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (26)
On October 7, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 550, Statutes of 2017.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On September 11, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3131.).
On September 7, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 9 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2574.).
On September 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (September 1).
On August 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On June 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On June 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 31, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 5. Page 1883.)
On May 30, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 3.) (May 26).
On April 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 5, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 1.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 29, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On March 28, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
On March 27, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On March 23, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
On February 27, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On February 14, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
On February 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
September 11, 2017: AB 470 ARAMBULA Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 2
September 7, 2017: Assembly 3rd Reading AB470 Arambula By Pan
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
September 1, 2017: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
August 21, 2017: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 21, 2017: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
May 31, 2017: AB 470 ARAMBULA Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 72
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 3
May 26, 2017: Do pass.
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 3
April 4, 2017: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor