+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 3, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 31, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
On April 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 27, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On February 21, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on E. & R.
On February 12, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 14.
On February 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor