+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On November 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Died on inactive file.
On September 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Padilla.
On August 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On August 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (August 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On July 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 27, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 25. Page 2190.)
On May 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 24).
On May 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (May 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 1, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file.
On February 28, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On February 20, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
On February 19, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (4)
August 14, 2013: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
June 27, 2013: AB 458 WIECKOWSKI Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 25
May 24, 2013: Do pass.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 5
May 13, 2013: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor