+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (31)
On February 3, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
On January 3, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
On October 7, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Vetoed by Governor.
On September 13, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On September 7, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 65. Noes 2. Page 2826.).
On September 2, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 4 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 1. Page 2340.).
On August 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 26).
On August 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to suspense file.
On July 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
On June 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 2, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 4. Page 1819.)
On May 27, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1629.)
- Assembly Rule 69(b) suspended. (Ayes 58. Noes 17. Page 1581.)
On May 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (May 20).
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1460.)
On May 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On May 5, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 4, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On May 3, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 29).
On April 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on ELECTIONS.
On April 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ELECTIONS. Read second time and amended.
On March 15, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on ELECTIONS.
On March 11, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ELECTIONS. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on ELECTIONS.
On February 9, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 11.
On February 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Votes (8)
September 7, 2021: AB 446 Mayes Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 65
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 13
September 2, 2021: Assembly 3rd Reading AB446 Mayes By Glazer
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 7
August 26, 2021: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
August 16, 2021: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
July 12, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
June 2, 2021: AB 446 Mayes Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 70
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 5
May 20, 2021: Do pass.
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 3
April 29, 2021: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor